Global Patent Index - EP 0755639 B1

EP 0755639 B1 2002-11-20 - Collapsible container, especially for clothing

Title (en)

Collapsible container, especially for clothing

Title (de)

Zusammenlegbarer Behälter, insbesondere für Kleidungsstücke

Title (fr)

Récipient pliable, en particulier pour des vêtements

Publication

EP 0755639 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96110861 A

Priority

DE 19527298 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0755639A2] The container comprises a rectangular base (1) and top (2) which are permanently joined by a folding system of rods (9,10). The rods are pivotally fixed to the base and top and each consist of two parts (9a,9b;10a,10b) hinged (11,12) together and positioned in each corner of the container parallel with one side of the container. The two rods at opposite facing corners of the container have an at least two-part (17a,17b) connecting rod (17) between them hinged (20) together. The bottom and top parts have peripheral walls (4,5,7,8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 43/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 43/04 (2006.01); B65D 6/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 43/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0755639 A2 19970129; EP 0755639 A3 19990602; EP 0755639 B1 20021120; AT 227950 T 20021215; DE 19527298 A1 19970130; ES 2187593 T3 20030616

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060706

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LEIFHEIT A.G.

- Effective date: 20040731

2007-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060706

2005-07-20 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050720

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-07-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050705

2005-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040705

2005-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LEIFHEIT A.G.

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040705

2004-07-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040705

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030731

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030731

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-07-25 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030725

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-07-21 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030721

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-07-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030716

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-07-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030716

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2187593 T3

2003-05-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH ES FR GB IT LI NL

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227950 T 20021215

2001-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010309

1999-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990702

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH ES FR GB IT LI NL

1997-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH ES FR GB IT LI NL