Global Patent Index - EP 0755651 B1

EP 0755651 B1 2002-11-13 - Control device for loading differentiated volumes of washing liquid in a dishwashing machine

Title (en)

Control device for loading differentiated volumes of washing liquid in a dishwashing machine

Title (de)

Kontrollvorrichtung zum Eingeben von unterschiedlichen Mengen von Spülflüssigkeit in einer Geschirrspülmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de contrôle pour charger différents volumes de liquide de lavage dans un lave-vaisselle

Publication

EP 0755651 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96201808 A

Priority

IT MI950558 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0755651A2] A device for controlling the loading of washing liquid in a dishwashing machine comprises a first tank (8) arranged as an offtake to the supply of liquid by a solenoid valve (4) for supplying a washing tank (1) of the dishwashing machine so as to receive a smaller first fraction of liquid, connecting means (15, 50) that keep the first tank (8) in communication with the tank (1) during the loading of the washing liquid so that the level of the liquid in the first tank (8) coincides with the level of the liquid in the washing tank (1), level detection means (9, 10, 13) associated with the first tank (8) to perform the closing of the supplying solenoid valve (4) when the level of the liquid in the first tank (8) and in the washing tank (1) exceeds a first predetermined level (L1), a second tank (16) also arranged as an offtake to the supply of liquid by the supplying solenoid valve (4) so as to receive a smaller second fraction of said liquid, and a syphon-like conduit (19) associated with said second tank (16) that is triggered when the level of the liquid in the second tank (16) reaches a second prescribed level (L2) so as to transfer the liquid present in the second tank (16) completely into the first tank (8) so as to determine the intervention of said level detection means (9, 10, 13). The second tank (16) is provided with a first baffle (20, 21) suitable for circumscribing a portion of tank (A, C). Air venting means (22, 23) are associated with said portion of tank (A, C) that can be opened or closed to allow or to prevent, when open or when closed, respectively, the liquid from filling said portion of tank (A, C), so that said second prescribed level (L2) is reached when a first or a second volume of liquid, respectively, is present in the second tank (16), the first volume of liquid being larger than the second volume of liquid. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/4244 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0755651 A2 19970129; EP 0755651 A3 19990324; EP 0755651 B1 20021113; ES 2184830 T3 20030416; IT 237085 Y1 20000831; IT MI950558 U1 19970127; IT MI950558 V0 19950727

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090629

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080625

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080508

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-07-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184830 T3

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020207

1999-11-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990910

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT

1997-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT