Global Patent Index - EP 0755701 B1

EP 0755701 B1 2000-03-08 - Fluoroproteinaceous emulsifier forming polyvalent film

Title (en)

Fluoroproteinaceous emulsifier forming polyvalent film

Title (de)

Polyvalenter, filmbildender Fluoroproteinemulgator

Title (fr)

Emulseurs fluoroprotéiniques formant film polyvalents

Publication

EP 0755701 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401470 A

Priority

FR 9509139 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0755701A1] A new film-forming emulsion with fire extinguishing properties comprises a protein hydrolysate associated with :-a) At least one fluorinated co-telomer of the general formula:- in which : Rf = perfluoroalkyl, opt. branched, 6C min. ; k =0 - 6(but not 0 if m not equal to 1) ; Rf-(CH2)k-Xm-(CH2)n-Sp-(M<1>)q<1)<M<2>) q<2>-Y (I) X = O, CO2, or OCO ; m = 0 or 1 ; n = 0 - 6(but not 0 if m and/or p = 1) ; M<1> = an anionic hydrophilic monomer unit, and M<2> = a non-ionic hydrophilic monomer unit ; q<1> and q<2> are numbers of which the sum is 5 -100 and the ratio q<2>/q<1> is 1 - 20 ; Y = H when p = 1, and I, Br, or Cl when p = 0 ; and b) At least one fluorinated surfactant, an aq. soln. of which (1 g/l) gives a surface tension at 20 degrees C. less than 25mN/m.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62D 1/04 (2006.01); A62D 1/02 (2006.01); B01F 17/00 (2006.01); B01F 17/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62D 1/0085 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0755701 A1 19970129; EP 0755701 B1 20000308; AU 6075196 A 19970130; CA 2181831 A1 19970128; DE 69606931 D1 20000413; DE 69606931 T2 20001012; ES 2144707 T3 20000616; FR 2737126 A1 19970131; FR 2737126 B1 19980206; JP H0938235 A 19970210; US 5824238 A 19981020

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140703

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140703

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69606931

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150331

2015-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140703

2015-02-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69606931

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130712

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130724

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130703

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130626

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-12-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69606931

- Representative's name: VON ROHR PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090704

2010-09-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090704

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080821

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-04-02 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-09-17 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-02-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. ELF ATOCHEM

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-08-23 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ATOFINA

2000-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144707 T3

2000-06-08 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000608

2000-05-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000505

2000-05-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SAMA PATENTS

2000-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69606931 20000413

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-03-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-03-08 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000308

1999-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990520

1997-01-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960706

1997-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE