Global Patent Index - EP 0755707 B1

EP 0755707 B1 2001-12-12 - Partitioned distillation column

Title (en)

Partitioned distillation column

Title (de)

Unterteilte Destillationskolonne

Title (fr)

Colonne de distillation divisée

Publication

EP 0755707 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96109986 A

Priority

US 44806495 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5709780A] An integrated distillation column having a partitioned stripping or absorption section is presented. The integrated stripping/distillation column comprises a single shell housing a refluxed absorption section and a reboiled stripping section. The stripping section is partitioned by a vertical wall into first and second separate portions having upper end in fluid communication the absorption section. The stripping portions include fluid isolated lower ends having separate reboilers. In the integrated absorption/distillation column, the absorption section is partitioned and separate reflux loops are provided for each portion of the absorption section. In such a manner, a two column distillation process can be combined into one for achieving space and equipment savings.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01D 3/14; B01D 3/16; B01D 53/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 3/14 (2006.01); B01D 3/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01D 3/141 (2013.01); B01D 3/14 (2013.01); B01D 3/146 (2013.01); B01D 3/322 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

US 5709780 A 19980120; AU 5615896 A 19970130; AU 700987 B2 19990114; EP 0755707 A1 19970129; EP 0755707 B1 20011212; ES 2164807 T3 20020301; JP 3966564 B2 20070829; JP H09117602 A 19970506; NO 314247 B1 20030224; NO 963077 A 19970127; NO 963077 D0 19960723; US 5755933 A 19980526

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160621

2016-09-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160927

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160619

2016-07-13 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160619

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150611

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150528

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150618

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150526

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100101

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080530

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2164807 T3

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT NL

2001-05-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KELLOGG BROWN & ROOT, INC.

1999-02-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981218

1997-09-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970724

1997-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT NL