Global Patent Index - EP 0755734 B1

EP 0755734 B1 2001-05-09 - Cold extrusion method for forming a bevel gear integral with a rotation pivot, and the gear obtained by said method

Title (en)

Cold extrusion method for forming a bevel gear integral with a rotation pivot, and the gear obtained by said method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Kaltfliesspressen eines Kegelzahnrades mit integrierter Welle und damit hergestelltes Kegelzahnrad

Title (fr)

Procédé pour l'extrusion à froid d'une roue dentée conique avec arbre de rotation intégral et roue dentée conique ainsi obtenue

Publication

EP 0755734 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96201948 A

Priority

IT MI951640 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0755734A1] The invention provides a method and mould for forming, by cold extrusion of a metal blank, a small-dimension bevel gear (34) integral with a rotation pivot (26) extending from the roots of the teeth (33) of said gear (34). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21K 1/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21K 1/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21K 1/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0755734 A1 19970129; EP 0755734 B1 20010509; AT 200992 T 20010515; DE 69612706 D1 20010613; DE 69612706 T2 20020418; ES 2158228 T3 20010901; IT 1277365 B1 19971110; IT MI951640 A1 19970127; IT MI951640 D0 19950727

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120712

2013-10-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20131018

2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69612706

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120711

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130329

2013-03-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120711

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110725

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110727

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-11-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110726

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110805

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2158228 T3

2001-08-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612706 20010613

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB

2001-05-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010509

2001-05-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200992 T 20010515

2001-04-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LEONARDO S.R.L.

2000-03-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000208

1997-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970711

1997-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB