Global patent index - EP 0755756 B1

EP 0755756 B1 2000-01-05 - Hand-hold drilling machine with device for switching between operating modes "drilling" and "percussive drilling"

Title (en)

Hand-hold drilling machine with device for switching between operating modes "drilling" and "percussive drilling"

Title (de)

Handbohrmaschine mit Einrichtung zum Umschalten der Betriebsarten "Bohren" und "Schlagbohren"

Title (fr)

Perçeuse portative avec dispositif de commutation entre un mode de fonctionnement "forage" et un mode "forage à percussion"

Publication

EP 0755756 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96109456 A

Priority

DE 19527117 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0755756A2] The electric hammer drill has an axially displaceable drilling spindle (4) supported by an axial roller bearing (42). The adjustment member (30) acts on the spindle through the bearing and is mounted between the partition wall (6) on the engine side and a drive wheel (18) set on the spindle. The adjustment member interacts directly with the partition and either the adjustment member or partition has an axially extended projection (34) facing the relevant other part which interacts with an indentation (36) in the other part.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25D 16/00; B25D 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23B 45/16 (2006.01); B25D 16/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25D 16/006 (2013.01); B25D 16/00 (2013.01); B25D 2211/064 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0755756 A2 19970129; EP 0755756 A3 19980128; EP 0755756 B1 20000105; DE 19527117 A1 19970130; DE 19527117 C2 20000531

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160612

2016-07-06 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20160612

2016-06-13 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59604090

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150623

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150623

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150623

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59604090

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: LORENZ & KOLLEGEN PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2015-06-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100613

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090626

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-06-15 [REG FR D3] DECISION TO REVOKE THE DECISION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: D3

2007-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070228

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-06-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59604090

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-10

2000-01-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUZZI, NOTARO&ANTONIELLI D'OULX

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990203

1998-04-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980220

1998-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1997-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT