EP 0755804 A1 19970129 - Thermal mimeograph paper
Title (en)
Thermal mimeograph paper
Title (de)
Thermisches Schablonenpapier
Title (fr)
Papier thermique pour l'impression miméographique
Publication
Application
Priority
- EP 91900953 A 19901221
- JP 33448089 A 19891222
Abstract (en)
The present invention provides a thermal mimeograph paper comprising a porous backing material (2) and a thermoplastic resin film layer (1) laminated on one side thereof through an adhesive (3), characterized by being of a point-bonded structure wherein said porous backing material (2) and said thermoplastic resin film (1) are bonded together by dotwise point bonding. This point-bonded structure enables the perforability of mimeograph paper to be improved. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B41N 1/24 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
B41N 1/241 (2013.01 - EP US); Y10S 428/913 (2013.01 - EP US); Y10T 428/24802 (2015.01 - EP US); Y10T 428/24826 (2015.01 - EP US); Y10T 428/24851 (2015.01 - EP US); Y10T 428/2486 (2015.01 - EP US); Y10T 428/24876 (2015.01 - EP US); Y10T 428/24934 (2015.01 - EP US); Y10T 428/31895 (2015.04 - EP US); Y10T 428/31993 (2015.04 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [X] EP 0331748 A1 19890913 - DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 142 (M - 692) 30 April 1988 (1988-04-30)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 281 (M - 520) 25 September 1986 (1986-09-25)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 428 (M - 762) 11 November 1988 (1988-11-11)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 269 (M - 259) 30 November 1983 (1983-11-30)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 275 (M - 261) 8 December 1983 (1983-12-08)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE FR GB
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0460236 A1 19911211; EP 0460236 A4 19920115; EP 0460236 B1 19970319; CA 2046889 A1 19910623; CA 2046889 C 19950606; DE 69030251 D1 19970424; DE 69030251 T2 19971127; EP 0755804 A1 19970129; JP H03193393 A 19910823; US 5270099 A 19931214; WO 9109742 A1 19910711
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 91900953 A 19901221; CA 2046889 A 19901221; DE 69030251 T 19901221; EP 96111393 A 19901221; JP 33448089 A 19891222; JP 9001676 W 19901221; US 74340191 A 19911002