Global Patent Index - EP 0755832 B1

EP 0755832 B1 2001-05-16 - System for triggering occupant restraint in a vehicle

Title (en)

System for triggering occupant restraint in a vehicle

Title (de)

System zur Auslösung eines Rückhaltemittels in einem Fahrzeug

Title (fr)

Système pour déclencher un moyen de retenue dans un véhicule

Publication

EP 0755832 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96110718 A

Priority

DE 19527813 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19527813C1] The system has each portion (3) of a distributed ignition system, interfaced (35) via a data line (4) to the trigger circuit in a central controller, supplied separately with current from the battery (31). It incorporates a storage capacitor sufficient to operate the ignition device (33) if battery voltage is lost in an accident. The ignition device activating an air bag or seat belt is connected to an ignition stage, pref. power transistor, (32) triggered by an acceleration-sensitive (micro)mechanical switch (34). Functions and parameters of the ignition system are checked by a diagnostic device (36).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60R 21/32; B60R 22/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 21/01 (2006.01); F42C 15/24 (2006.01); B60R 16/02 (2006.01); B60R 16/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60R 21/017 (2013.01); F42C 15/24 (2013.01); B60R 16/0315 (2013.01); B60R 2021/01075 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19527813 C1 19961017; EP 0755832 A1 19970129; EP 0755832 B1 20010516; US 5718452 A 19980217

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090702

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090702

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090702

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080715

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080726

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-08-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606895 20010621

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991115

1997-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970218

1997-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT