Global Patent Index - EP 0755836 B1

EP 0755836 B1 2000-12-27 - Mastercylinder

Title (en)

Mastercylinder

Title (de)

Geberzylinder

Title (fr)

Maître-cylindre

Publication

EP 0755836 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96111174 A

Priority

DE 19527655 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0755836A1] The cylinder has a primary (14) and a secondary piston (13). The secondary piston has an axially moveable guide (6). This moves in the cylinder bore (2) and is pretensioned by a spring (23). The guide carries piston seals (11,12) to seal it against the secondary piston. The cylinder also has bore seals (10,9). The seal (10) associated with the primary piston's pressure chamber (16) has a smaller diameter than that associated with the secondary piston's pressure chamber (15). The guide consists of two parts (7,8), at least one of which is plastics.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60T 11/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60T 11/20 (2006.01); B60T 11/236 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60T 11/20 (2013.01); B60T 11/236 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0755836 A1 19970129; EP 0755836 B1 20001227; DE 19527655 A1 19970130

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100331

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20071012

2007-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070731

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-03-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020711

2002-07-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020711

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010627

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-03-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010202

2001-02-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606248 20010201

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-04-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000229

1999-01-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO. OHG

1997-09-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970729

1997-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB