Global Patent Index - EP 0755859 B1

EP 0755859 B1 2000-05-03 - Rowlock, in particular for a foldable boat

Title (en)

Rowlock, in particular for a foldable boat

Title (de)

Dolle, insbesondere für ein Faltboot

Title (fr)

Dame de nage, notamment pour bateau pliant

Publication

EP 0755859 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401567 A

Priority

FR 9509145 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0755859A1] The folding boat is made from thin rigid panels (1) which are hinged to form a hull whose upper edge (2) carries an overhanging gunwale (3). The rowlock comprises a socket (7) passing through the gunwale which is housed partially in an indentation (8) in the panel upper edge. It projects laterally outside the gunwale beyond the indentation either side the corresponding panel. Across the panel the overall width of the rowlock is less than the width of the gunwale. The rowlock is fixed to the panel by flanges (10) pressed between the external portion of the socket and the panel. The flanges are fixed to each other by fixing screws and nuts (12) passing through the panel. The socket has an overflowing annular head (9) supported on the upper face of the gunwale.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63H 16/06; B63B 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 7/00 (2006.01); B63H 16/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63H 16/06 (2013.01); B63B 7/00 (2013.01); B63B 2007/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0755859 A1 19970129; EP 0755859 B1 20000503; CA 2182129 A1 19970128; CA 2182129 C 19990504; DE 69608042 D1 20000608; DE 69608042 T2 20001012; ES 2145400 T3 20000701; FR 2737180 A1 19970131; FR 2737180 B1 19970912

INPADOC legal status


2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070717

2008-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070717

2005-07-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050716

2005-07-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050714

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-03-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020716

2003-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030201

2003-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CITTADINI DANIEL

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020716

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010728

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-07-24 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20010724

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-07-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010711

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2145400 T3

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69608042 20000608

2000-05-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000504

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

1999-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990412

1997-04-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970212

1997-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT