Global Patent Index - EP 0755894 B1

EP 0755894 B1 2001-03-14 - Method and apparatus for measuring the load in an elevator car

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for measuring the load in an elevator car

Title (de)

Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Messung der Last in einer Aufzugskabine

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour mesurer la charge dans une cabine d'ascenseur

Publication

EP 0755894 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96111277 A

Priority

CH 218795 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0755894A1] The load measuring system detects the compression of the springs (9) supporting the lift cabin (3) relative to a surrounding carrier frame (7) for detecting variations in the load within the lift cabin. The movement of the lift cabin relative to the carrier frame and the lift shaft is detected via an endless band (12) displaced in conjunction with the lift cabin and a cooperating pulse generator (13). This provides a signal (SL) which is evaluated for controlling the current for the lift drive motor (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 1/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01G 19/14 (2006.01); B66B 1/30 (2006.01); B66B 1/34 (2006.01); B66B 3/00 (2006.01); B66B 5/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 1/3484 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0755894 A1 19970129; EP 0755894 B1 20010314; AT 199699 T 20010315; BR 9603180 A 20040817; CA 2181882 A1 19970127; CA 2181882 C 20070109; DE 59606572 D1 20010419; JP 3628814 B2 20050316; JP H0943039 A 19970214; US 5852264 A 19981222

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-04-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080712

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2009-02-27 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-02-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20071015

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070716

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-07-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070719

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-03-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-09-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-09-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010314

2001-08-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606572 20010419

2001-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-03-14 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010314

2001-03-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010314

2001-03-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010314

2001-03-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199699 T 20010315

1999-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991006

1997-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970617

1997-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI