Global Patent Index - EP 0756016 B1

EP 0756016 B1 2000-05-24 - Aircraft body member, more particularly for supersonic aircraft, made from a long-living, damage tolerant aluminium alloy with good stress corrosion resistance

Title (en)

Aircraft body member, more particularly for supersonic aircraft, made from a long-living, damage tolerant aluminium alloy with good stress corrosion resistance

Title (de)

Zellenbauteil, insbesondere für Überschallflugzeuge, hergestellt aus einer Aluminiumlegierung mit hoher Lebensdauer, guter Schadenstoleranz und hoher Spannungskorrosionsbeständigkeit

Title (fr)

Elément de structure d'aéronef, et notamment d'avion supersonique, en alliage d'aluminium présentant une longue durée de vie, une bonne tolerance aux dommages et une bonne résistance à la corrosion sous contrainte

Publication

EP 0756016 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401680 A

Priority

FR 9509246 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0756016A1] An aircraft component is made of an Al alloy containing 2.00-3.00 wt.% Cu, 1.40-1.90 wt.% Mg, 0.20-0.70 wt.% Mn, 0-0.30 wt.% Fe, 0-0.30 wt.% Ni, 0-0.15 wt.% Ti, at least 0.05 wt.% Si and 0-1.10% Ag, where 0.40 Si + 0.4 Ag 0.60 and Si + Ag + 1.1 Mg 2.6. One alloy exemplified contains 0.40-0.60% Si and no Ag, and another contains 0.20-0.40% Si and 0.40-0.60% Ag.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 21/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 21/12 (2006.01); C22C 21/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 21/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0756016 A1 19970129; EP 0756016 B1 20000524; AU 6075496 A 19970206; AU 703162 B2 19990318; CA 2182058 A1 19970129; CA 2182058 C 20081209; DE 69608506 D1 20000629; DE 69608506 T2 20010118; ES 2148699 T3 20001016; FR 2737224 A1 19970131; FR 2737224 B1 19971017; JP 3791972 B2 20060628; JP H09104941 A 19970422

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100727

2011-08-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110818

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100726

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100726

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69608506

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100726

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090725

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090722

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090720

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090722

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148699 T3

2000-08-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000728

2000-07-12 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: AEROSPATIALE MATRA

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69608506 20000629

2000-06-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: PROPRIA S.R.L.

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

1999-09-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990802

1997-09-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970704

1997-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT