Global patent index - EP 0756028 B1

EP 0756028 B1 2000-01-19 - Electromagnetic yarn brake and loom with such yarn brake

Title (en)

Electromagnetic yarn brake and loom with such yarn brake

Title (de)

Elektromagnetische Fadenbremse und Webmaschine mit einer Fadenbremse

Title (fr)

Frein de fil électromagnétique et métier à tisser avec un tel frein de fil

Publication

EP 0756028 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95810479 A

Priority

EP 95810479 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0756028A1] An electro-magnetic thread brake has a stationary electro-magnet (1) comprising a coil, a core with an armature and a passive and an active braking agent, i.e. plate, which is coupled to the armature (4) to move against the passive agent when the electro-magnet is excited. The core (3) can be adjusted to vary the air gap between core and armature. Also claimed is a loom with the above brake where a thread tension sensor is located before the brake and connected with a controller for transmission of a signal for regulating the thread brake.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/34; B65H 59/22; B65H 59/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 59/22 (2006.01); B65H 59/24 (2006.01); D03D 47/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/34 (2013.01); B65H 59/225 (2013.01); B65H 59/24 (2013.01); B65H 2555/13 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0756028 A1 19970129; EP 0756028 B1 20000119; DE 59507651 D1 20000224

INPADOC legal status

2006-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-07-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050724

2004-07-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040706

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLICATION

- Owner name: SULZER TEXTIL AG

2000-04-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59507651

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000224

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

1999-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990226

1997-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970602

1997-05-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE IT

1997-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

1997-01-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: SI