Global Patent Index - EP 0756060 B1

EP 0756060 B1 2000-06-07 - Quick assembly door or window frame

Title (en)

Quick assembly door or window frame

Title (de)

Schnell montierbarer Rahmen für Fenster oder Tür

Title (fr)

Châssis de porte ou de fenêtre à montage rapide

Publication

EP 0756060 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96110565 A

Priority

DE 19527388 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0756060A1] One edge of the frame, parallel to its longitudinal direction, has a cover (8) resting against the pane. The frame is joined by a fixture (1) to a transverse arm. The fixture pin (2) fits into a hole in the cover. A tie piece fitting into a cavity in the frame prevents the fixture slipping towards the pin axis. The part of the outside of the fixture facing away from the transverse arm is rotationally symmetrical with the pin axis (4). The end of the pin is fixed into a bolt (3) rotatably positioned on the pin axis in the fixture.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/964

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/96 (2006.01); E06B 3/964 (2006.01); E06B 3/968 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/9642 (2013.01); E06B 3/9604 (2013.01); E06B 3/9644 (2013.01); E06B 3/9684 (2013.01); E06B 3/9687 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0756060 A1 19970129; EP 0756060 B1 20000607; AT 193746 T 20000615

INPADOC legal status


2008-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000630

2002-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020403

2001-06-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2001-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010430

2000-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: KNAUST KLAUS

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20001130

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-09-07 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000907

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605387 20000713

2000-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-06-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000629

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK FR

2000-06-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193746 T 20000615

1999-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990616

1997-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970721

1997-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK FR