Global Patent Index - EP 0756134 B1

EP 0756134 B1 2000-06-28 - Method and burner for reducing the formation of NOx when burning pulverized coal

Title (en)

Method and burner for reducing the formation of NOx when burning pulverized coal

Title (de)

Verfahren und Brenner zur Verminderung der Bildung von NOx bei der Verbrennung von Kohlenstaub

Title (fr)

Procédé et brûleur pour la réduction de la production de NOx lors de la combustion de charbon pulvérisé

Publication

EP 0756134 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96106401 A

Priority

DE 19527083 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0756134A1] The burner involves connecting a primary dust pipe (6) to a dust pipe (7) and conveying a mixed flow of primary air and coal dust. The primary dust pipe is enclosed by a secondary and tertiary air pipes (10,11), both of which continue into a conically widening section. The pipes have a swirling appliance (22,23) and are connected to a spiral inlet housing (16,17). The outlet end of the primary dust pipe has a stabiliser ring (8), the primary dust pipe is enclosed by a primary gas pipe (9) forming a ring channel. A dust-free part-flow of the mixed current flows through the primary gas pipe. A part-flow rich in dust flows through the primary dust pipe. The dust pipe contains a swirl piece (24) downstream from which is an immersion pipe (25) connected to the primary gas pipe by an outward leading pipe (26) via a spiral inlet housing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23C 99/00 (2006.01); F23D 1/00 (2006.01); F23D 1/02 (2006.01); F23D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 17/005 (2013.01); F23D 1/00 (2013.01); F23D 1/02 (2013.01); F23C 2201/20 (2013.01); F23C 2202/10 (2013.01); F23D 2201/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FI FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0756134 A1 19970129; EP 0756134 B1 20000628; AU 5461196 A 19970130; AU 727761 B2 20001221; CA 2175113 A1 19970126; CN 1152686 A 19970625; DE 19527083 A1 19970130; DK 0756134 T3 20001106; ES 2149402 T3 20001101; JP H0942611 A 19970214; PL 181172 B1 20010629; PL 314866 A1 19970203; RU 2147708 C1 20000420; US 5832847 A 19981110; US 5979342 A 19991109; ZA 9603667 B 19961120

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-03-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59605487

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121101

2012-11-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20121101

2012-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110425

2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2012-06-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110430

2012-06-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20120604

2012-02-06 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110502

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110420

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100424

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100424

2010-07-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100426

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100423

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090424

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090420

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-03-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2009-02-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080424

2008-12-26 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2008-12-26 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2008-12-26 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2008-10-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: HITACHI POWER EUROPE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-09-17 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2007-04-20 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070420

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-01 [NLR4] NL: RECEIPT OF CORRECTED TRANSLATION IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AT THE INITIATIVE OF THE PROPRIETOR OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR4

2000-11-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2149402

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-08-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-08-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605487

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-03

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FI FR GB NL

2000-04-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BBP ENERGY GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-11-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHOD AND BURNER FOR REDUCING THE FORMATION OF NOX WHEN BURNING PULVERIZED COAL

1999-10-13 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHOD AND BURNER FOR REDUCING THE FORMATION OF NOX WHEN BURNING PULVERIZED COAL

1998-05-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BABCOCK KRAFTWERKSTECHNIK GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-04-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980302

1997-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970716

1997-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FI FR GB NL