Global Patent Index - EP 0756151 B1

EP 0756151 B1 2000-07-12 - Ignition system for a propulsive charge of a submunition ejected from a cargo munition

Title (en)

Ignition system for a propulsive charge of a submunition ejected from a cargo munition

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Zünden einer Treibladung für eine aus einem Trägergeschoss geworfene Submunition

Title (fr)

Système d'amorçage de la charge propulsive d'une sous-munition embarquée dans un engin porteur

Publication

EP 0756151 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401344 A

Priority

FR 9509140 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0756151A1] The detonator has a movable percussion head (22) and a detonator carrier (20) which is motor driven between safe and armed positions. Two locks for the detonator carrier retain the charge in a safe condition before ejection of the sub munition. A delayed action self destruct charge is used. One of the locks is formed by a cam (50) driven by a motor (62) between a safety position in which movement of the charge is stopped and a release position. A safety lock for the cam is released after launching of the submunition. The cam carries a secondary detonator for a delayed action self destruct ignition cord.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42C 9/14; F42C 15/192

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42C 9/14 (2006.01); F42C 15/192 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42C 9/142 (2013.01); F42C 15/192 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0756151 A1 19970129; EP 0756151 B1 20000712; DE 69609255 D1 20000817; DE 69609255 T2 20010104; FR 2737293 A1 19970131; FR 2737293 B1 19971017; US 5670736 A 19970923

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080620

2009-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080620

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070530

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-06-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060608

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060530

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-09-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69609255

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-17

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1999-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990204

1997-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970304

1997-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB