Global Patent Index - EP 0756301 B1

EP 0756301 B1 2001-12-19 - Thermostat

Title (en)

Thermostat

Title (de)

Temperaturwächter

Title (fr)

Thermostat

Publication

EP 0756301 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96106744 A

Priority

DE 19527254 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0756301A2] The temperature controlled switching device has a bimetallic actuator disc Ä29Ü that is supported above a metal spring diaphragm Ä22Ü within an insulator insert Ü16Ü in a metal housing Ä13Ü. At the centre of the disc is a movable contract Ä34Ü that normally engages a fixed contact Ä24Ü on a cover plate Ä14Ü. The contacts are coupled to input and output wires Ä41,43Ü and a temperature increase is produced to cause switching at a specific point. An additional input is provided by a resistance heating elements on base substrate Ä26Ü that provides rapid switching for a sudden overload

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 37/54; H01H 81/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/50 (2006.01); H01H 37/54 (2006.01); H01H 81/02 (2006.01); H01H 11/00 (2006.01); H01H 37/52 (2006.01); H01H 71/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 81/02 (2013.01); H01H 1/504 (2013.01); H01H 37/5427 (2013.01); H01H 11/0006 (2013.01); H01H 37/52 (2013.01); H01H 71/164 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0756301 A2 19970129; EP 0756301 A3 19980527; EP 0756301 B1 20011219; AT 211300 T 20020115; DE 19527254 A1 19970130; DE 19527254 C2 20000120; US 5745022 A 19980428

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070429

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2008-01-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071101

2007-12-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-04-18 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060418

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-04-18 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060418

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-04-13 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060413

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-04-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060411

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-05-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050527

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59608480 20020131

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI NL

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 211300 T 20020115

2000-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000609

1998-08-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980618

1998-05-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI NL

1997-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI NL