Global patent index - EP 0756561 B1

EP 0756561 B1 2000-07-12 - CONTAINER SYSTEM FOR DOCUMENTS

Title (en)

CONTAINER SYSTEM FOR DOCUMENTS

Title (de)

BEHÄLTERSYSTEM FÜR BRIEFE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE COFFRETS POUR LETTRES

Publication

EP 0756561 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96904000 A

Priority

  • DE 19505442 A
  • DE 19548113 A
  • EP 9600491 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9625335A2] The invention relates to a transport container system suitable in particular for use in delivery services, in which there are combinable container components of various sizes, the length and width of which correspond to a uniform frame. A first part of the components is of a length corresponding to the width of the second part of the basic component, whereby the length of said other part of the basic component is a quadruple of the width of the first.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 21/02; B65D 21/04; B65D 25/20; B65D 43/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 21/02 (2006.01); B65D 21/04 (2006.01); B65D 25/20 (2006.01); B65D 43/02 (2006.01); B65D 51/24 (2006.01); B65D 55/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 55/06 (2013.01); B65D 21/0235 (2013.01); B65D 21/045 (2013.01); B65D 25/205 (2013.01); B65D 43/0204 (2013.01); B65D 51/245 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00194 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00296 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00509 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00537 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00555 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00574 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00666 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00694 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00768 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00805 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9625335 A2 19960822; WO 9625335 A3 19961107; AT 194569 T 20000715; CZ 9602474 A3 19970514; EP 0756561 A1 19970205; EP 0756561 B1 20000712; ES 2150658 T3 20001201; SK 111596 A3 19970507

INPADOC legal status

2016-02-06 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59605576

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150206

2015-10-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 194569

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20150206

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150422

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130207

2014-05-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140219

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-04-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20140408

2013-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2013-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120228

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120206

2012-11-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20121031

2012-09-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: DEUTSCHE *POST A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20120228

2012-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SCHOELLER PLAST TRANSPORTBEHALTER SYSTEME A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20120228

2011-07-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110226

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110301

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110225

- Year of fee payment: 16

2003-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2002-03-06 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020306

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2150658

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-10-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-09-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605576

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-17

2000-07-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

2000-07-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 194569

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-10-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHOELLER PLAST TRANSPORTBEHAELTER SYSTEME AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-10-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEUTSCHE POST AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-05-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980325

1997-02-26 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D17D

1997-02-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960814

1997-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL