Global Patent Index - EP 0756657 B1

EP 0756657 B1 2001-05-09 - USE OF TROUGH-SHAPED CARRIERS FOR RAPID SET-UP OF A SMALL STATION PLATFORM

Title (en)

USE OF TROUGH-SHAPED CARRIERS FOR RAPID SET-UP OF A SMALL STATION PLATFORM

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG VON TROGFÖRMIGEN LÄNGSTRÄGERN ZUR SCHNELLEN MONTAGE EINES KLEINEN BAHNSTEIGS

Title (fr)

UTILISATION DES PLATEAUX EN FORME D'AUGE POUR L'ASSEMBLAGE RAPIDE D'UN PETIT QUAI

Publication

EP 0756657 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96904815 A

Priority

  • DE 29503328 U
  • EP 9600682 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9625558A1] The invention pertains to a station platform composed in part of pre-cast concrete members and plain concrete blocks spaced out in the direction of the platform's longitudinal axis, and longitudinal girders which rest on the plain concrete blocks, are of a length approximately equal to the distance between two plain concrete blocks, and on which are supported deck slabs which are spaced to form joints and span the longitudinal girders with overlap on at least one side, characterised in that the cross section of the through-shaped longitudinal girders (3) shows an approximately horizontal base (31) with legs (32, 33) extending upwards and outwards therefrom, the base (31) resting with its ends on separate blocks (2) and the legs (32, 33) being adjusted to bear the deck slabs (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01F 1/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29503328 U1 19950413; AT 201076 T 20010515; CZ 5762 U1 19970416; EP 0756657 A1 19970205; EP 0756657 B1 20010509; HU 9602790 D0 19961128; PL 105650 U1 19970317; PL 58270 Y1 20001229; WO 9625558 A1 19960822

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 201076 T

- Effective date: 20160216

2016-02-16 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59606868

2015-05-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150218

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-02-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: TRIPLES-GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FRENZEL-BAU GMBH & CO. KG, 31084 FREDEN, DE

- Document: DE 59606868

- Effective date: 20140110

2014-02-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59606868

- Representative's name: WABLAT LANGE KARTHAUS ANWALTSSOZIETAET, DE

- Effective date: 20140110

2014-01-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59606868

- Representative's name: WABLAT LANGE KARTHAUS ANWALTSSOZIETAET, DE

2010-06-30 [PGRI DE] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Effective date: 20100322

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080215

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FRENZEL-BAU GMBH & CO. KG

- Free text: FRENZEL-BAU GMBH & CO. KG#ALTER SONNENBERGWEG 4#31084 FREDEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- FRENZEL-BAU GMBH & CO. KG#ALTER SONNENBERGWEG 4#31084 FREDEN (DE)

2003-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DR. LUSUARDI AG

2003-10-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: FRENZEL-BAU GMBH & CO. KG

- Free text: OTTO FRENZEL BAUUNTERNEHMEN#ALTER SONNENBERGWEG 4#31084 FREDEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- FRENZEL-BAU GMBH & CO. KG#ALTER SONNENBERGWEG 4#31084 FREDEN (DE)

2002-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606868 20010613

2001-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2001-05-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201076 T 20010515

2000-03-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: USE OF TROUGH-SHAPED CARRIERS FOR RAPID SET-UP OF A SMALL STATION PLATFORM

1998-06-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980427

1997-02-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961009

1997-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI