Global patent index - EP 0756662 B1

EP 0756662 B1 2000-07-12 - DOOR HINGE WITH INTEGRATED SECURING DEVICE

Title (en)

DOOR HINGE WITH INTEGRATED SECURING DEVICE

Title (de)

TÜRSCHARNIER MIT INTEGRIERTER FESTSTELLVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

CHARNIERE DE PORTE A DISPOSITIF D'ARRET INTEGRE

Publication

EP 0756662 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94912469 A

Priority

  • DE 9400431 W
  • US 42425095 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9529318A1] The invention concerns a door hinge with an integrated securing device for flexibly positioning a door at predetermined angles relative to a frame, in particular for positioning a motor vehicle door. The door hinge comprises a first hinge part (1, 101), a spiral spring (18) mounted on a base plate (2, 102) of the first hinge part (1, 101), and a second hinge part (30) which is located on the door side and in which rollers (35, 36) are rotatably mounted. The rollers (35, 36) deform the spiral spring (18) when the second hinge part (30) is pivoted relative to the first hinge part (1, 101). The spiral spring (18) comprises three U-shaped sections.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 11/10 (2006.01); B60J 5/04 (2006.01); D06B 17/02 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

E05F (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06B 17/02 (2013.01); E05D 11/1042 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/531 (2013.01); Y10T 16/5402 (2013.01); Y10T 16/54028 (2013.01); Y10T 16/551 (2013.01); Y10T 16/555 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9529318 A1 19951102; DE 59409451 D1 20000817; EP 0756662 A1 19970205; EP 0756662 B1 20000712; ES 2150988 T3 20001216; JP 3634371 B2 20050330; JP H09512073 A 19971202; US 5524324 A 19960611; ZA 9503136 B 19960104

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070420

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060502

2007-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20060421

2007-03-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20061230

2006-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060420

2006-12-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2006-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-04-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060421

2006-04-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060421

2006-04-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060420

2005-04-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050419

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-04-19 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050419

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-04-07 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050407

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-03-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050322

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-03-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050307

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2150988

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-11-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-10-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20001003

2000-10-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MAROSCIA & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59409451

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-17

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1998-08-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980625

1997-02-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961107

1997-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE