Global Patent Index - EP 0756994 B1

EP 0756994 B1 2000-02-09 - Packaging machine for introducing or removing groups of bottles or similar containers into or from bottle crates or similar packages

Title (en)

Packaging machine for introducing or removing groups of bottles or similar containers into or from bottle crates or similar packages

Title (de)

Packmaschine zum gruppenweisen Ein- oder Auspacken von Flaschen oder dergl. Behältern in bzw. aus Flaschenkästen oder dergl. Gebinde

Title (fr)

Machine d'emballage pour introduire ou enlever des groupes de bouteilles ou récipients similaires dans ou hors des caisses pour bouteilles ou emballages similaires

Publication

EP 0756994 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96110631 A

Priority

DE 19528357 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0756994A1] The packing machine includes packing head supports (21) each with at least one packing head (8) having several grippers (7). The packing heads are provided movable on the packing head support for the additional movement lift which is superimposed on the movement of the rotor (9) and intermediate supports (18). For each packing head support at least one control curve (30) controlling the additional movement lift is provided on the intermediate support associated with the packing head support. Each packing head support can be formed by a console bracket on which a packing head slide (23) is vertically displaceable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 21/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 21/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 21/183 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0756994 A1 19970205; EP 0756994 B1 20000209; DE 19528357 A1 19970206

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000731

2005-07-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050702

2001-11-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2001-09-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010928

2001-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010501

2001-04-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20010201

2001-02-21 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20000702

2001-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010201

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-07-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000702

2000-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-03-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Free Format Text: ERRATUM: THE FOLLOWING EUROPEAN PATENTS WERE ADVERTISED IN ERROR IN JOURNAL 5781 DATED 1 MARCH 2000 AS HAVING BEEN FILED UNDER SECTION 77(6)(A) ON 8 FEBRUARY 2000.

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59604400

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-16

2000-03-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1999-10-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990716

1997-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970224

1997-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL