Global Patent Index - EP 0757007 B1

EP 0757007 B1 2000-03-22 - Fixing ring with double-indexation means

Title (en)

Fixing ring with double-indexation means

Title (de)

Befestigungsring mit Doppelindexiervorrichtung

Title (fr)

Bague de fixation à double indexation

Publication

EP 0757007 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401647 A

Priority

FR 9509363 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0757007A1] The fixing ring (10) consists of a cap (11) for fitting onto the neck (2) of a container (1) and is made with an aperture for the end of the dispenser unit, e.g. a pump. The cap and bottle neck have alignment elements (20, 21) for positioning the cap in relation to the neck. The fixing ring has an upper section (14) to receiver the dispenser unit, also equipped with alignment elements (30) for correct positioning of the dispenser.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/16; B05B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/00 (2006.01); B65D 83/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/3049 (2013.01); B65D 83/205 (2013.01); B05B 11/3059 (2013.01); B65D 2215/04 (2013.01); B65D 2251/04 (2013.01); B65D 2303/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0757007 A1 19970205; EP 0757007 B1 20000322; DE 69607260 D1 20000427; DE 69607260 T2 20001026; ES 2146848 T3 20000816; FR 2737471 A1 19970207; FR 2737471 B1 19970905; US 5772080 A 19980630

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160331

2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140725

2015-08-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150827

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140724

2015-05-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69607260

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140724

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140724

2015-02-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69607260

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140728

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-11-27 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: APTAR FRANCE SAS

- Effective date: 20141121

2014-11-04 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: APTAR FRANCE S.A.S.

- Effective date: 20141029

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130710

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130719

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130716

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130709

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-08-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: APTAR FRANCE SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VALOIS S.A., LE NEUBOURG, FR

- Document: DE 69607260

- Effective date: 20130625

2013-08-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69607260

- Representative's name: BITTNER & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20130625

2013-08-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69607260

- Representative's name: BITTNER & PARTNER RECHTS- UND PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20130625

2013-06-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69607260

- Representative's name: BITTNER & PARTNER, DE

2013-02-08 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: APTAR FRANCE SAS, FR

- Effective date: 20130104

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146848 T3

2000-06-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-05-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000508

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607260 20000427

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990713

1997-10-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970731

1997-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT