Global Patent Index - EP 0757129 B1

EP 0757129 B1 2001-12-05 - Application system for a device for coating a paper or paperboard sheet

Title (en)

Application system for a device for coating a paper or paperboard sheet

Title (de)

Auftragsystem für eine Vorrichtung zum Beschichten einer Papier- oder Kartonbahn

Title (fr)

Système d'application pour un appareil de revêtement d'une feuille de papier ou carton

Publication

EP 0757129 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96106054 A

Priority

  • DE 19527903 A
  • DE 19604934 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5766350A] In a web-coating apparatus a web moving continuously in a travel direction passes in a contact arc partially around a cylindrical surface of a backing roller centered on an axis. An applicator system has an applicator roller extending parallel to the backing roller, having a smooth cylindrical outer surface, and forming a gap with the backing roller. The web passes through the gap. A substantially stationary support extends generally parallel to the backing roll axis across a full width of the web and a pusher element limitedly movable generally radially toward and away from the backing-roller axis on the support bears radially of the backing-roller axis on the applicator roller along the full width of the web. An inflatable hose between the pusher element and the support along the full width of the web urges the element and applicator roller toward the backing roller. A coating liquid is supplied to the gap across the full width of the web.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 23/38; D21H 23/56; D21H 25/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 1/08 (2006.01); D21H 23/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 1/083 (2013.01); D21H 23/58 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FI GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 5766350 A 19980616; AT 210223 T 20011215; EP 0757129 A1 19970205; EP 0757129 B1 20011205; ES 2167480 T3 20020516

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2010-01-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090418

2008-09-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20080415

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080418

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070418

2006-04-18 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060418

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-04-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050418

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030419

2003-04-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030419

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-24 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2002-06-05 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20011205

2002-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2167480 T3

2002-04-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020418

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59608346 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI GB IT

2001-12-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210223 T 20011215

1999-02-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981223

1997-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970122

1997-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI GB IT