Global Patent Index - EP 0757132 B1

EP 0757132 B1 2000-09-06 - Bridge element, especially for surmounting gaps by vehicles and system for transporting and placing the bridge element

Title (en)

Bridge element, especially for surmounting gaps by vehicles and system for transporting and placing the bridge element

Title (de)

Brückenteil, insbesondere zur Überwindung von Gräben durch Fahrzeuge und System zum transportieren und ablegen von solchen Brückenteilen

Title (fr)

Structure de travure destinée en particulier au franchissement de brèches par des véhicules et système de transfert et de dépose d'une telle structure

Publication

EP 0757132 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401711 A

Priority

FR 9509433 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0757132A1] The bridge consists of two parallel span sections with upper rolling surfaces, connected by arms (3c) in a general omega-shape with coaxial base members in the form of shafts (16). The shafts are connected to the bridge sections by ball joints (17), and they are also able to rotate and slide in bearings (24). Each of the arms (16) is additionally equipped with mechanism in the form of two identical and parallel cams (27) which return the arm automatically to its normal operating position in a plane perpendicular to the linked span sections.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01D 15/127

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01D 15/127 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01D 15/127 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE GB IT LI LU MC

EPO simple patent family

EP 0757132 A1 19970205; EP 0757132 B1 20000906; EP 0757132 B9 20011121; DE 69610175 D1 20001012; DE 69610175 T2 20010510; FR 2737513 A1 19970207; FR 2737513 B1 19971010; US 5862557 A 19990126; WO 9705333 A1 19970213

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69610175

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130731

2013-05-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121001

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120731

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-02-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-02-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: CONSTRUCTIONS INDUSTRIELLES DE LA MEDITERRANEE- *C

- Effective date: 20110731

2011-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100906

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100723

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-11-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20100831

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100730

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-10-29 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20100727

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2001-01-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001207

2000-12-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-10-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69610175 20001012

2000-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE GB IT LI LU MC

2000-01-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991125

1997-10-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970802

1997-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE GB IT LI LU MC