Global Patent Index - EP 0757144 B1

EP 0757144 B1 2000-11-02 - Combination lock

Title (en)

Combination lock

Title (de)

Kombinationsschloss

Title (fr)

Serrure à combinaisons

Publication

EP 0757144 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95305501 A

Priority

EP 95305501 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0757144A1] A combination lock includes a dial shaft (22) adapted to be rotated with a user's hand, a fore lock plate (38a), at least one intermediate lock plate (38b,c) and a rear lock plate (38d) arranged in parallel with each other, and a driving plate (33) integrally fitted to the rear end of the dial shaft (22). A plurality of unlocking cutouts (35,41a,b,c,d) are formed on the outer peripheries of the driving plate (33) and all the lock plates (38a-d) so as to allow a lock pawl (A) to be received in the unlocking cutouts when the latter are located in alignment with each other. A driving gear (36) having a large diameter is formed in the driving plate (33), and a follower gear (43) having a small diameter is formed on the fore lock plate (38a). Both the gears mesh with each other at a gear ratio via an idle gear (44) so as to allow both the gears (36,43) to be rotated in the opposite direction. The gear ratio is determined such that all the lock plates (38a-d) are followably rotated as a dial knob is turned with a user's hand. Usually, the number of lock plates is four, and the gear ratio of the driving gear (36) to the follower gear (43) is set 3 : 1. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 37/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 37/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 37/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0757144 A1 19970205; EP 0757144 B1 20001102; DE 69519291 D1 20001207; DE 69519291 T2 20010712

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070804

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050729

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060804

2007-06-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060804

2007-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-09-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050929

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-08-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050808

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050729

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69519291 20001207

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-09-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

1999-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990316

1997-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970714

1997-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT