Global Patent Index - EP 0757219 B1

EP 0757219 B1 2002-09-18 - Pack of heat exchanger plates for regenerative heat exchanger

Title (en)

Pack of heat exchanger plates for regenerative heat exchanger

Title (de)

Heizblechpaket für Regenerativ-Wärmetauscher

Title (fr)

Paquet de plaques d'échange thermique pour échangeur régénérateur

Publication

EP 0757219 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96111403 A

Priority

DE 19528634 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0757219A2] The hot plate packet comprises a number of adjacent profile plates held together but leaving flow channels between them. On at least two opposing packet sides (18, 19) the two outer profile plates (14, 15) are formed as sandwich-type shape-stable profile plate pairs. One profile plate of the pair is undulated and the other is corrugated. The profile plates are joined to one another by welding points (16). The vertical outer rail (20) of the profile plates are connected to horizontal rails (21) on the packet upper and lower sides. The face surfaces of the horizontal rails are located at the same height as the face surfaces of the radial walls of the cells of the hot surface carrier (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28D 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 3/02 (2006.01); F28D 19/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 19/044 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0757219 A2 19970205; EP 0757219 A3 19980114; EP 0757219 B1 20020918; AT 224526 T 20021015; AU 6077096 A 19970206; AU 699782 B2 19981217; CZ 288231 B6 20010516; CZ 9602303 A3 19970212; DE 19528634 A1 19970206; HU 219043 B 20010228; HU 9602121 A2 19970328; HU 9602121 A3 19980928; HU 9602121 D0 19960930; JP H09119790 A 19970506; MX 9603164 A 19970731; PL 179713 B1 20001031; PL 315465 A1 19970217; US 6253833 B1 20010703; ZA 9606572 B 19980518

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-07-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030716

2003-06-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-03-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020918

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-12-18 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609680 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224526 T 20021015

2001-07-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HAMON ROTHEMUEHLE COTTRELL GMBH

2000-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000718

1998-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

1997-02-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960725

1997-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB IT NL