Global Patent Index - EP 0757339 B1

EP 0757339 B1 2001-01-10 - Intrusion alarm

Title (en)

Intrusion alarm

Title (de)

Einbruchmelder

Title (fr)

Alarme anti-intrusion

Publication

EP 0757339 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95111942 A

Priority

EP 95111942 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0757339A1] The alarm consists of a permanent magnet (5) attached to one part of the opening and an alarm housing (1) attached to the other part. The alarm housing contains an alarm circuit (3) with a reed contact (4) arranged at an angle to the side wall of the alarm housing. The permanent magnet is mounted parallel to a side wall of the housing and triggers the reed contact. The reed contact can be arranged at an angle of 45 degrees to the housing side wall.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0757339 A1 19970205; EP 0757339 B1 20010110; DE 59508957 D1 20010215

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59508957

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20091015

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090918

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2009-01-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Free text: SIEMENS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES AG C-IPR#GUBELSTRASSE 22#6300 ZUG (CH) -TRANSFER TO- SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#WITTELSBACHERPLATZ 2#80333 MUENCHEN (DE)

2007-02-28 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SIEMENS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES AG C-IPR

- Free text: SIEMENS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES AG#BELLERIVESTRASSE 36#8034 ZUERICH (CH) -TRANSFER TO- SIEMENS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES AG C-IPR#GUBELSTRASSE 22#6300 ZUG (CH)

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-08 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508957 20010215

2001-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI

2001-01-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES AG

2000-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000609

1999-05-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES AG

1997-09-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970724

1997-05-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI

1997-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI