Global Patent Index - EP 0757364 B1

EP 0757364 B1 2000-05-17 - Transformer

Title (en)

Transformer

Title (de)

Transformator

Title (fr)

Transformateur

Publication

EP 0757364 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96112174 A

Priority

DE 19528185 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0757364A2] The HV transformer is produced with a two part core assembly where each part is U-shaped Ä3,4Ü and has a film hinge on one side Ä5Ü. The air gap between the core parts may be adjusted by changing the thickness of a plastic spacer Ä9Ü. The spacer is an integral part of an arm that projects from the coil Ä2Ü windings former Ä1Ü. The spacer has a series of different thickness sections each with separation lines Ä10a,10b ---Ü.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 3/14; H01F 41/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 3/14 (2006.01); H01F 41/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 3/14 (2013.01); H01F 41/0206 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

DE 2948134 A1 19800703 - HITACHI LTD

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0757364 A2 19970205; EP 0757364 A3 19970326; EP 0757364 B1 20000517; DE 19528185 A1 19970206

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040727

2005-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-07-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040727

2003-07-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030709

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-07-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030707

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030530

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-23 [REG FR D6] PATENT ENDORSED LICENCES OF RIGHTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: D6

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-23 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 746

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-06-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605224

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-21

2000-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000518

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000517

1998-03-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980114

1997-10-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970829

1997-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1997-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT