Global patent index - EP 0757370 B1

EP 0757370 B1 2000-07-05 - Electric discharge tube or discharge lamp and scandate dispenser cathode

Title (en)

Electric discharge tube or discharge lamp and scandate dispenser cathode

Title (de)

Elektrische Entladungsröhre oder Entladungslampe und Scandat-Vorratskathode

Title (fr)

Tube à décharge électrique ou lampe à décharge et cathode à réserve comprenant du scandate

Publication

EP 0757370 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96202114 A

Priority

DE 19527723 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0757370A1] An electrical discharge lamp, eg low pressure gas type, has a scandate dispenser cathode that is formed of a cathode body covered with an emitting surface. The cathode body is of a matrix formed from either a high melting point material or a high melting point alloy together with a barium binding material. Chemical reaction results in emission from the surface. A cover with one or more layers of tungsten and/or tungsten alloy, an intermediate layer of rhenium and a top coating of scandium oxide mixed with a rare earth metal oxide completes the structure

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 1/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 1/15 (2006.01); H01J 1/28 (2006.01); H01J 61/067 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 1/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0757370 A1 19970205; EP 0757370 B1 20000705; DE 19527723 A1 19970206; JP 3957344 B2 20070815; JP H09106751 A 19970422; US 6348756 B1 20020219

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160724

2016-08-17 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20160724

2016-07-25 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59605538

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150930

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150730

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150727

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PHILIPS GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59605538

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-07-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59605538

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-07-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59605538

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE

2015-07-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59605538

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MEISSNER BOLTE PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

2015-01-02 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

- Effective date: 20141126

2015-01-02 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PR

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20141126

2014-05-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PHILIPS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59605538

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140327

2014-05-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59605538

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140327

2014-05-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PHILIPS GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59605538

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140327

2014-05-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59605538

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140327

2014-05-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PHILIPS GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59605538

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140327

2002-12-31 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 746

- Effective date: 20021205

2002-11-22 [REG FR D6] PATENT ENDORSED LICENCES OF RIGHTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: D6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000728

2000-08-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605538

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-10

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-01-12 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

2000-01-12 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

1999-10-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990830

1998-08-26 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

1998-08-26 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

1997-10-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970805

1997-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB