Global Patent Index - EP 0757410 B1

EP 0757410 B1 2000-03-22 - Plug connection in cable connecting devices for high tension-power current applications

Title (en)

Plug connection in cable connecting devices for high tension-power current applications

Title (de)

Steckvorrichtung für Kabelverbindungen im Hochspannungs-Starkstrombereich

Title (fr)

Connexion à fiche pour dispositif de connexion de câbles au domaine de haute tension et de courant fort

Publication

EP 0757410 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96112084 A

Priority

DE 19528126 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0757410A2] The high voltage (HV) cable connector has the core of the cable fitted with a plug element Ä1aÜ that is inserted into a socket bush element Ä2aÜ. For ease of insertion, a clearance Ä5Ü is provided between the plug and socket. In order to ensure good electrical contact between them the plug is fitted with a contact ring Ä3aÜ that fits in a groove . The ring is produced as a toroidal ring of coil spring material with a large number of coils making contact with socket. The coils are free to deflect and lie flat during insertion of the plug and finally latch into the groove Ä17Ü of the socket

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/53

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/187 (2006.01); H01R 13/53 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/187 (2013.01); H01R 13/53 (2013.01); H01R 13/111 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0757410 A2 19970205; EP 0757410 A3 19970730; EP 0757410 B1 20000322; DE 19528126 A1 19970206

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-05-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59604739

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140726

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150331

2015-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150201

2015-02-27 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-02-25 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150201

2015-02-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59604739

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130726

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130722

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-10-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130719

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130722

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130719

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130719

- Year of fee payment: 18

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604739 20000427

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI NL

1999-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990806

1997-11-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970823

1997-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI NL

1997-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI NL