Global Patent Index - EP 0757613 B1

EP 0757613 B1 2001-12-12 - ELECTRIC SHAVER

Title (en)

ELECTRIC SHAVER

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHER RASIER APPARAT

Title (fr)

RASOIR ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 0757613 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96902990 A

Priority

  • EP 9600724 W
  • IT MI950366 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9626046A1] Electric shaver including a housing (2) that forms a handgrip and supports, at an end portion, at least one shaving head (5) in which the face coming into contact with the contour to be shaved has passages for the hairs to be shaved. The shaving head accommodates a cutting blade (7), and the housing accommodates a drive (40-44) for rotatably actuating the cutting blade about an axis (24a) that lies substantially at right angles to the resting face of the shaving head. The shaving head is supported by a flexible membrane (8) connected to the housing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26B 19/14; B26B 19/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26B 19/14 (2006.01); B26B 19/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26B 19/145 (2013.01); B26B 19/14 (2013.01); B26B 19/146 (2013.01); B26B 19/38 (2013.01); B26B 19/3853 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9626046 A1 19960829; DE 69617830 D1 20020124; DE 69617830 T2 20020822; EP 0757613 A1 19970212; EP 0757613 B1 20011212; IT 1273970 B 19970711; IT MI950366 A1 19960826; IT MI950366 D0 19950224

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100221

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100221

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090227

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090430

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090302

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-06-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-12-11 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69617830 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2001-12-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2000-05-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000407

1998-07-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

1998-07-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS DOMESTIC APPLIANCES AND PERSONAL CARE B.V

1998-07-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DESSILANI, TERESIO

1997-04-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970211

1997-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL