Global Patent Index - EP 0757697 A4

EP 0757697 A4 2000-05-17 - USE OF AGENTS WHICH BLOCK INTERCELLULAR ADHESION MOLECULE/RECEPTOR INTERACTION IN THE TREATMENT OF RESPIRATORY VIRAL INFECTION

Title (en)

USE OF AGENTS WHICH BLOCK INTERCELLULAR ADHESION MOLECULE/RECEPTOR INTERACTION IN THE TREATMENT OF RESPIRATORY VIRAL INFECTION

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG VON AGENTIEN, DIE DIE INTERZELLÜLARE WECHSELWIRKUNG INHIBIEREN, IN DER BEHANDLUNG VON VIRALEN INFEKTIONEN DES ATEMWEGES

Title (fr)

UTILISATION D'AGENTS BLOQUANT L'INTERACTION MOLECULE D'ADHESION INTERCELLULAIRE/RECEPTEUR DANS LE TRAITEMENT D'UNE INFECTION RESPIRATOIRE VIRALE

Publication

EP 0757697 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95916347 A

Priority

  • US 9504519 W
  • US 22599794 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9527736A1] The present invention relates to the use of intercellular adhesion molecules (ICAM-1), their functional derivatives, and molecules which bind to them, in methods to increase gas exchange in the lungs of a patient suffering from a respiratory viral infection.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 16/28; A61K 39/00; A61K 39/265; A61K 39/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); C07K 16/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/70525 (2013.01); C07K 14/70553 (2013.01); C07K 16/2821 (2013.01); C07K 16/2845 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9306842 A1 19930415 - BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA [US]
  • [X] EP 0289949 A2 19881109 - DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC [US]
  • [X] EP 0314863 A2 19890510 - BAYLOR COLLEGE MEDICINE [US], et al
  • [X] EP 0391088 A2 19901010 - BLOOD RES LAB CENTER [US]
  • [X] US 5235049 A 19930810 - MCCLELLAND ALAN [US], et al
  • [PX] WEGNER, CRAIG D: "Adhesion molecules in allergy", PROG. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., PROC. INT. CONGR. ALLERGOL. CLIN. IMMUNOL., 15TH (1995), MEETING DATE 1994, 13-18. EDITOR(S): JOHANSSON, STIG G. O. PUBLISHER: HOGREFE & HUBER, SEATTLE, WASH., XP000881448
  • [A] WEGNER C D ET AL: "Intercellular adhesion molecule-1 (ICAM-1) in the pathogenesis of asthma.", SCIENCE, (1990 JAN 26) 247 (4941) 456-9., XP000872999
  • [A] KAPELANSKI D P ET AL: "Lung reperfusion injury is reduced by inhibiting a CD18-dependent mechanism.", JOURNAL OF HEART AND LUNG TRANSPLANTATION, (1993 MAR-APR) 12 (2) 294-306;DISCUSSION 306-7., XP000881402
  • [A] ROTHLEIN R ET AL: "TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATION WITH ANTI-ICAM-1", RESEARCH IN IMMUNOLOGY,FR,PARIS, vol. 144, no. 9, 1 January 1993 (1993-01-01), pages 735 - 739,754-76, XP000575989
  • See also references of WO 9527736A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9527736 A1 19951019; CA 2187360 A1 19951019; EP 0757697 A1 19970212; EP 0757697 A4 20000517; JP H09512252 A 19971209

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011108

2001-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000825

2000-05-17 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1997-02-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961112

1997-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE