Global Patent Index - EP 0757744 B1

EP 0757744 B1 2001-05-30 - PROFILED SEAL WITH A COATED SEALING BEAD

Title (en)

PROFILED SEAL WITH A COATED SEALING BEAD

Title (de)

DICHTUNGSPROFIL MIT BESCHICHTETER DICHTWULST

Title (fr)

GARNITURE D'ETANCHEITE PROFILEE A BOURRELET D'ETANCHEITE ENDUIT

Publication

EP 0757744 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96902866 A

Priority

  • DE 9600240 W
  • DE 19506245 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19506245A1] A profiled seal made of elastic material for window profiles may be used in an advantageous manner, in particular at the weather side, if the sealing elements (12, 13) associated to the top side of the base body (10) of the profiled seal are provided with a decorative coating (33) made of a UV-resistant, non-cellular material. This decorative coating (33) makes it possible to give to the profiled seal a special appearance or a special design, and in addition allows very flexible materials to be used, in particular when the sealing elements (12, 13) are made of different materials, since the latter can be covered by the decorative coating (33).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/62 (2013.01); E06B 2003/6208 (2013.01); E06B 2003/6223 (2013.01); E06B 2003/6232 (2013.01); E06B 2003/6244 (2013.01); E06B 2003/6264 (2013.01); E06B 2003/627 (2013.01); E06B 2003/6273 (2013.01); E06B 2003/6276 (2013.01); E06B 2003/6279 (2013.01); E06B 2003/6291 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19506245 A1 19960829; AT 201742 T 20010615; EP 0757744 A1 19970212; EP 0757744 B1 20010530; WO 9626346 A1 19960829

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-09-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020903

2002-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SAAR-GUMMIWERK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-02-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020213

2001-12-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-11-28 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-08-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010830

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606983 20010705

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

2001-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201742 T 20010615

1998-08-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980626

1997-02-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961009

1997-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL