Global Patent Index - EP 0757948 B1

EP 0757948 B1 2000-04-05 - Device for marking of reservations in a seat providing system

Title (en)

Device for marking of reservations in a seat providing system

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Kennzeichnung von Reservierungen in einem Platzangebotssystem

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le marquage des réservations dans un système d'offre des sièges

Publication

EP 0757948 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96107848 A

Priority

DE 19529076 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0757948A1] The device has a seating display (7) for indicating the reservation condition of the individual seats and at least one overall display (5) for indicating the overall seat reservation condition. The seating display is coupled to a microprocessor control with an input device (4) for entering the seat reservations and a memory (1) for holding the reserved seat information.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 41/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61D 41/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 41/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0757948 A1 19970212; EP 0757948 B1 20000405; DE 19529076 A1 19970213

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140602

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140517

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150130

2015-02-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59604869

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140517

2014-12-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59604869

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130723

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130604

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130522

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110518

2012-01-10 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-01-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604869 20000511

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

1999-01-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981204

1997-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970812

1997-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE