Global Patent Index - EP 0758000 B1

EP 0758000 B1 2001-12-19 - Polyimide films from pyromellitic dianhydride and 2,2'-bis(perfluoroalkoxy)benzidines as alignment layers for liquid crystal displays

Title (en)

Polyimide films from pyromellitic dianhydride and 2,2'-bis(perfluoroalkoxy)benzidines as alignment layers for liquid crystal displays

Title (de)

Polyimidfilme aus Pyromellitsäureanhydrid und 2,2'-Bis(perfluoroalkoxy)benzidine als Orientierungschicht für Flüssigkristallanzeigevorrichtungen

Title (fr)

Films de polyimide à partir de dianhydride pyromellitique et de 2,2'-bis(perfluoroalkoxy)benzidines pour couches d'alignement d'affichage à cristaux liquides

Publication

EP 0758000 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96109910 A

Priority

US 51260795 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0758000A2] A polyimide alignment film based on pyromellitic dianhydride and a 2,2'-bis(perfluoroalkoxy)benzidine, as major components, for use in liquid crystal display devices.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08G 73/10; G02F 1/1337

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08G 73/10 (2006.01); G02F 1/1337 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02F 1/133723 (2013.01); C08G 73/1039 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1027 (2013.01); Y10T 428/31721 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0758000 A2 19970212; EP 0758000 A3 19970219; EP 0758000 B1 20011219; DE 69618104 D1 20020131; DE 69618104 T2 20020718; JP H09120071 A 19970506; US 5670609 A 19970923

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090620

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090620

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090620

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080625

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080617

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080626

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080603

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080626

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69618104 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2001-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010207

1997-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970314

1997-02-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1997-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL