Global Patent Index - EP 0758031 B1

EP 0758031 B1 2000-01-19 - Washing products dispenser

Title (en)

Washing products dispenser

Title (de)

Waschmittel-Einspüleinrichtung

Title (fr)

Distributeur de produits de lavage

Publication

EP 0758031 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96110567 A

Priority

DE 19528977 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0758031A1] The detergent flushing device has fresh water distributing ducts, which are located above detergent chambers and have outflow openings (14-16) for supplying fresh water to the chambers. At least a proportion of the outflow openings (16) have an enlarged cross section compared to the holes located laterally in the main flow direction. The has a flow divider (17) which is located before the enlarged holes (16) and guides the flow mainly to the laterally positioned holes (14).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 39/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0758031 A1 19970212; EP 0758031 B1 20000119; AT 189012 T 20000215; DE 19528977 A1 19970213; DE 59604213 D1 20000224; ES 2144670 T3 20000616; TR 9600609 A2 19970221; TR 9600609 A3 19970221

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-04-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150628

2016-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59604213

2015-05-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH, 81739 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59604213

- Effective date: 20150408

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140617

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140630

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140626

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100629

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-07-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110715

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090624

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090629

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2006-06-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060628

2005-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050628

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144670 T3

2000-04-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-02-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604213 20000224

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

2000-01-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189012 T 20000215

1999-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990208

1998-07-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

1997-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970806

1997-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI