Global patent index - EP 0758034 B1

EP 0758034 B1 2000-05-31 - Apparatus and process for connecting two prestressed concrete elements

Title (en)

Apparatus and process for connecting two prestressed concrete elements

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Verbinden von zwei Spannbetonelementen

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour raccorder deux éléments en béton précontraint

Publication

EP 0758034 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96109873 A

Priority

DE 19528999 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0758034A1] A second stressed concrete pipe (12) at a face-side abutment (14) is connected with a first stressed concrete pipe. It is formed rotation-symmetrically around an axis (16). Inside the walling (18) of the second concrete pipe run the second tension braids (22), which have already been moulded into the pipe during prodn. The second braids run pref. parallel to each other in an axial direction inside the wall of the second stressed concrete pipe. Due to being embedded, the braids are not fixed in special end anchoring arrangements, but run as far as the face-side abutment, or shortly before it, and end there.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01D 2/00; E01D 21/00; E04H 12/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01D 2/00 (2006.01); E01D 21/00 (2006.01); E04H 12/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01D 21/00 (2013.01); E01D 2/00 (2013.01); E04H 12/16 (2013.01); E01D 2101/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0758034 A1 19970212; EP 0758034 B1 20000531; DE 19528999 A1 19970213; DE 19528999 C2 20000105; DK 0758034 T3 20001023; MX 9603111 A 19970329; US 5809711 A 19980922

INPADOC legal status

2003-03-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20030101

2003-02-17 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2003-02-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2003-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030101

2003-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030101

2002-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-06-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020620

2001-06-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010629

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-06-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010619

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-06-11 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010611

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-05-17 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010517

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-29 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-10-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-10-23 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605347

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-06

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES GB NL SE

2000-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000531

1999-09-22 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: PFLEIDERER INFRASTRUKTURTECHNIK GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

1999-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990722

1997-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970317

1997-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES GB NL SE