Global Patent Index - EP 0758070 B1

EP 0758070 B1 2002-09-18 - Signal lamp having a homogeneous appearance

Title (en)

Signal lamp having a homogeneous appearance

Title (de)

Signalleuchte mit gleichmässigem Erscheinungsbild

Title (fr)

Feu de signalisation d'aspect homogène

Publication

EP 0758070 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401546 A

Priority

FR 9508446 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0758070A1] The indicator light for a vehicle comprises a lamp mounted inside a reflecting mirror (1), and a tinted cover glass lens (4) mounted in front of the lamp. There is also a supplementary cover lens (2) surrounding the lamp. The light includes a series of wide and parallel ridges (42) formed on the inside surface of the cover glass lens (4). The supplementary lens (2) may include a similarly shaped front surface. Ridges may also be formed on the reflector surface (12). The supplementary lens may be tinted in order to colour the light produced by the lens, such that the light beam is of a different colour to the outward appearance of the cover glass when the light is turned off.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 9/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 43/255 (2018.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2736705 A1 19970117; FR 2736705 B1 19971003; DE 69623708 D1 20021024; DE 69623708 T2 20030612; EP 0758070 A1 19970212; EP 0758070 B1 20020918; ES 2182957 T3 20030316

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160713

2016-10-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20161026

2016-07-12 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69623708

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150710

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150731

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150731

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150713

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070712

2008-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070712

2006-06-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060623

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2182957 T3

2002-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021205

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69623708 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21V 9/08 A

2001-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010110

1997-10-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970804

1997-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT