Global Patent Index - EP 0758119 B1

EP 0758119 B1 2002-11-06 - Time measuring device for sports competitions

Title (en)

Time measuring device for sports competitions

Title (de)

Zeitnahmeeinrichtung für sportliche Wettbewerbe

Title (fr)

Dispositif de mesure de temps pour compétitions sportives

Publication

EP 0758119 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96112502 A

Priority

DE 29512812 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0758119A2] Racing pigeons are fitted with a ring that contains a transponder (12) which has an EPROM memory (20R). The memory holds identification data (21.i) that cannot be manipulated. A further section of memory can be used for writing-in contest data (21.s). The transponder has a resonance circuit (17,18) that allows an electromagnetic field (15) exchange of signals with a transmitting station (13) that has an antenna (14). Contest times can then be recorded. The station can be accessed for data entry via a terminal with exchange requiring a password for access.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07C 1/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 1/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29512812 U1 19961205; EP 0758119 A2 19970212; EP 0758119 A3 19980715; EP 0758119 B1 20021106; TW 318909 B 19971101

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150802

2016-06-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2016-05-04 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150901

2016-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150802

2016-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59609849

2015-01-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140820

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140821

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140821

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140831

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-06-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59609849

- Representative's name: BAUR & WEBER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-11-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090824

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030213

2002-12-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609849 20021212

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE GB LI NL

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020212

1999-10-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AEG IDENTIFIKATIONSSYSTEME GMBH

1998-08-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980616

1998-07-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE GB LI NL

1997-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE GB LI NL