Global Patent Index - EP 0758438 B1

EP 0758438 B1 2000-03-29 - DEVICE FOR THE COORDINATED CONTROL OF THE FLOW OF AT LEAST TWO GASES, AND BURNER COMPRISING SUCH DEVICE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR THE COORDINATED CONTROL OF THE FLOW OF AT LEAST TWO GASES, AND BURNER COMPRISING SUCH DEVICE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM KOORDINIERTEN STEUERN VON MINDESTENS ZWEI GASSTRÖMEN, UND DAMIT AUSGERÜSTETE BRENNER

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE COORDONNEE DE L'ECOULEMENT D'AU MOINS DEUX GAZ, ET BR LEUR LE COMPORTANT

Publication

EP 0758438 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96904911 A

Priority

  • FR 9600301 W
  • FR 9502509 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2731266A1] The invention relates to a device for the coordinated control of the flow of two gases, of the type comprising two supply conduits(10, 12), each provided with a stopvalve (20, 42; 60, 42; 20, 96), a first conduit (10) comprising a tapping (22; 64) for supplying with gas a pneumatic actuation member (22; 90) of the stopvalve (42; 96) of the second conduit (12), and wherein is provided a common member (20; 66) for controlling the supply of said actuation member and the flow in the first conduit (10), characterized in that the pneumatic actuation member (24, 90) actuates the stopvalve of the second conduit (12) for controlling the circulation of the gas only in the second conduit (12). Application to the control of the supply gases of the heating flame of a torch.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23N 1/02; F23D 14/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/46 (2006.01); F23N 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23N 1/027 (2013.01); F23D 14/465 (2013.01); F23N 2023/22 (2013.01); F23N 2027/24 (2013.01); F23N 2027/30 (2013.01); F23N 2027/36 (2013.01); F23N 2035/18 (2013.01); F23N 2041/11 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2731266 A1 19960906; FR 2731266 B1 19970523; AR 001129 A1 19970924; BR 9605922 A 19971118; CA 2189162 A1 19960912; DE 69607424 D1 20000504; EP 0758438 A1 19970219; EP 0758438 B1 20000329; WO 9627762 A1 19960912

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070227

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2007-01-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-01-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050113

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-09-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2001-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: LA SOUDURE AUTOGENE FRANCAISE

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2000-09-27 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2000-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69607424

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-04

2000-04-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-03-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000329

1999-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990811

1997-02-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961010

1997-02-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL