Global patent index - EP 0758595 B1

EP 0758595 B1 2000-01-19 - Adhesive stamp or tag or similar for attachement to documents, vehicles or similar

Title (en)

Adhesive stamp or tag or similar for attachement to documents, vehicles or similar

Title (de)

Klebestempel, Plakette od. dgl. zur Anbringung an Dokumenten, Kraftfahrzeugen od. dgl.

Title (fr)

Timbre pour adhésifs ou étiquettes ou analogues à installer sur des documents, véhicules ou analogues

Publication

EP 0758595 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96112172 A

Priority

DE 19529728 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19529728C1] This tamper-proof adhesive plaque or label is suitable for application e.g. to documents or vehicles. It has a substrate which carries elements of information and a transparent layer of plastic, which is intended never to become completely hard. At the edges of the plaque, there are novel projections, e.g. points (9), of an even- or uneven distribution. The surface of the plaque is coated, at least partially, with an adhesive material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60R 13/10; G09F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B32B 7/02 (2006.01); G09F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/0292 (2013.01); B32B 7/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DK ES FR IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19529728 C1 19961024; AT 188923 T 20000215; EP 0758595 A1 19970219; EP 0758595 B1 20000119

INPADOC legal status

2004-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030727

2002-11-29 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

- Owner name: TRAUTWEIN GMBH & CO TRANSFER- TRAUTWEIN SECURITY G

2002-07-16 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020716

- Year of fee payment: 07

2002-06-12 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020612

- Year of fee payment: 07

2001-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: TRAUTWEIN G.M.B.H. & CO.

- Effective date: 20000731

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-07-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT; NO LEGAL EFFECT FROM

2000-06-16 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-04-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-04-19 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-04-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FR IT LI NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 188923

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20000215

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1998-11-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981013

1997-09-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970723

1997-02-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FR IT LI NL PT SE