Global Patent Index - EP 0758634 B1

EP 0758634 B1 2001-03-07 - Composition having an incapacitating effect and apparatus for its application

Title (en)

Composition having an incapacitating effect and apparatus for its application

Title (de)

Zusammensetzung mit einem umschädlichmachenden Effekt und Vorrichtung zur dessen Anwendung

Title (fr)

Composition incapacitante, et dispositif pour sa mise en oeuvre

Publication

EP 0758634 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401751 A

Priority

FR 9509856 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0758634A1] Incapacitating compsns. comprise a synergistic mixt. of piperidides (I) and capsaicinoids (II). (II) is pref. capsaicin extracted from pimento of the salanacea family, taken from the Capsicum frutescens L. and C. annuum L gp. (I) may be obtd. from the essential oils of pepper of the piperaceae family e.g. Piper nigrum L., P. longum L. and P. officinarum. They may be formulated as powders impregnated with the active agents or solns. which may be projected towards a target, by means of a device consisting of an aerosol, a propellant and a vaporiser.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C06D 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C06D 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C06D 7/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0758634 A1 19970219; EP 0758634 B1 20010307; BR 9606575 A 19980707; DE 69611956 D1 20010412; DE 69611956 T2 20010802; ES 2155584 T3 20010516; FR 2737720 A1 19970214; FR 2737720 B1 19971024; JP H10508283 A 19980818; US 5821450 A 19981013; WO 9706123 A1 19970220

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050808

2004-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030809

2004-06-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-03-31 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030808

2004-03-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-02-29 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SOC. MEDITERRANNEENNE D'*AEROSOLS

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030809

2003-08-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030808

2002-09-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020913

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020822

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020807

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-06 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020806

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020729

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-02-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-06-07 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010607

2001-06-07 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010607

2001-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2155584 T3

2001-05-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2001-04-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010330

2001-04-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69611956 20010412

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010307

1998-05-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980406

1997-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970423

1997-02-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE