Global Patent Index - EP 0758700 B1

EP 0758700 B1 2001-12-12 - Multi-purpose building element with spring elements

Title (en)

Multi-purpose building element with spring elements

Title (de)

Mehrzweckbauteil mit Federelementen

Title (fr)

Elément de construction universel contenant des éléments ressort

Publication

EP 0758700 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96104854 A

Priority

DE 19529473 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19529473C1] The multipurpose construction part (1) is divided into individual surface sections (2). These are connected to each other via spring elements (3), which are integral with the part. The spring elements are loop-shaped, and located on the outside (5) of the individual sections. The elements are located in pairs, and the loops (6) face away from each other. The sections are movable relative to each other due to the spring elements, esp. turnable and/or relatively offset.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 17/20; E01C 5/20; E01C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 5/20 (2006.01); E01C 9/00 (2006.01); E02D 17/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 17/20 (2013.01); E01C 5/20 (2013.01); E01C 9/004 (2013.01); E01C 2201/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19529473 C1 19960822; AT 210768 T 20011215; DK 0758700 T3 20020311; EP 0758700 A1 19970219; EP 0758700 B1 20011212; ES 2168404 T3 20020616

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130327

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130331

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130331

2014-01-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59608415

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 210768 T

- Effective date: 20130327

2013-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-08-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MEYER AND KOLLEGEN, CH

2013-05-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110327

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110328

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120228

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110328

2012-06-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120224

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120213

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-04-23 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120423

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110327

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110327

2012-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-12-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-12-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110327

2011-11-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-10-31 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2011-10-19 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111001

2011-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *WEBER ALFRED

- Effective date: 20110331

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100323

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100331

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100325

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20100325

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-04-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: WEBER, ALFRED

- Free text: WEBER, ALFRED#GARTENSTR. 4A#91230 HAPPURG (DE) -TRANSFER TO- WEBER, ALFRED#GARTENSTR. 4A#91230 HAPPURG (DE)

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2168404 T3

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020227

2002-03-11 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59608415 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210768 T 20011215

1999-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990519

1999-06-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WEBER, ALFRED

1999-06-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WEBER, WOLFGANG

1997-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970403

1997-02-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE