Global Patent Index - EP 0758732 B1

EP 0758732 B1 2002-12-04 - Refrigerator

Title (en)

Refrigerator

Title (de)

Kühlgerät

Title (fr)

Réfrigérateur

Publication

EP 0758732 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96112307 A

Priority

  • DE 29513175 U
  • DE 29603716 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0758732A2] A refrigerator having main and freezer compartments employs evaporator sections which are connected in series and supplied with coolant via conduits (14) from a compressor controlled by a temperature sensor. The evaporator assembly in the main compartments is fronted by a dehumidifier plate of high thermal conductivity which is enlarged from the original area (10) to the combined area (10 + 12) in order to minimise water droplet formation over a range of working conditions. The resultant cooling performance of the enlarged assembly is however adjusted to the original temperature distribution by selective attachment of the plates (10,12) to the conduit (14).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 11/02 (2006.01); F25B 39/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 11/022 (2013.01); F25B 39/024 (2013.01); F25D 2317/0411 (2013.01); F25D 2400/08 (2013.01); F25D 2500/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0758732 A2 19970219; EP 0758732 A3 20000712; EP 0758732 B1 20021204; ES 2099057 T1 19970516; ES 2099057 T3 20030701

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-08-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110818

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100730

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59609940

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110331

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090723

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090731

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090707

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090722

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-06-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060719

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-03-18 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-07-25 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060725

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-07-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2099057 T3

2003-03-25 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609940 20030116

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT NL SE

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020422

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000629

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT NL SE

1997-05-16 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2099057 T1

1997-05-16 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

1997-05-01 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

1997-03-24 [ITCL] IT: TRANSLATION FOR EP CLAIMS FILED

- Representative's name: BUGNION S.P.A.

1997-02-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT NL SE