Global Patent Index - EP 0758733 B1

EP 0758733 B1 2000-11-02 - Air separation process and apparatus by low temperature rectification

Title (en)

Air separation process and apparatus by low temperature rectification

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Luftzerlegung durch Tieftemperaturrektifikation

Title (fr)

Procédé de séparation d'air par rectification à basse température

Publication

EP 0758733 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96112620 A

Priority

DE 19529681 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0758733A2] Low temp. rectification is used for air sepn. by a process in which air (1) is compressed (3) to at least the max. pressure within the rectifier column system (16) and is split into a first stream (4) as charge to the system and second stream (5) as oxidn. agent in a chemical reaction (6). First stream is cooled (14) to dew point temp. and is introduced (15) into one rectifier column (17). Liq. prod. stream (27) is withdrawn from the column and its pressure is increased (28). Process stream (30) of low temp. rectification is re-compressed to pressure above max. system pressure. Prod. stream is evapd. by indirect heat exchange (14) with at least part of re-compressed process stream. At least part of energy of expansion of off gas (8) of chemical reaction is used for the re-compression.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25J 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04018 (2013.01); F25J 3/04024 (2013.01); F25J 3/0403 (2013.01); F25J 3/0409 (2013.01); F25J 3/04103 (2013.01); F25J 3/04127 (2013.01); F25J 3/04145 (2013.01); F25J 3/04296 (2013.01); F25J 3/04357 (2013.01); F25J 3/04412 (2013.01); F25J 3/046 (2013.01); Y10S 62/915 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19529681 A1 19970213; DE 19529681 C2 19970528; DK 0758733 T3 20010115; EP 0758733 A2 19970219; EP 0758733 A3 19970730; EP 0758733 B1 20001102; US 5845517 A 19981208

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090805

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100302

2010-07-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-05-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100430

2010-04-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090805

2010-04-06 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2010-03-31 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100301

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080813

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080818

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080821

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20080815

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080803

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-03 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2003-10-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20030206

2003-07-30 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20030206

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'E

2001-09-26 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'E

- Effective date: 20010802

2001-01-15 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-12-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606078 20001207

2000-11-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB NL

1999-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990527

1997-09-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970729

1997-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB NL

1997-02-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB NL