Global Patent Index - EP 0758791 B1

EP 0758791 B1 2001-12-19 - Keybord with simplified switching pad and fixation device

Title (en)

Keybord with simplified switching pad and fixation device

Title (de)

Tastatur mit vereinfachter Schaltmatte samt Fixiervorrichtungen

Title (fr)

Clavier à natte de commutation simplifiée et dispositif de fixation

Publication

EP 0758791 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96110921 A

Priority

DE 19529492 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0758791A2] The keyboard is formed with a frame Ä6Ü that has a pattern of guide bushes Ä6Ü that each receive a pushbutton key Ä7Ü. The metal base Ä2Ü of the keyboard Ä4Ü has a switching foil Ä3Ü that consists of two contact foils separated by a gap. Located on top of this is an actuator foil mat Ä5Ü with a stabilising plate Ä15Ü and is formed with dome elements Ä10Ü having centre projections Ä11Ü. When a key is pressed the dome deflects to bring the projection into contact with the switching foil. The actuator foil is made in an elastomer material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 13/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/702 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/702 (2013.01); H01H 2215/008 (2013.01); H01H 2215/012 (2013.01); H01H 2229/024 (2013.01); H01H 2229/034 (2013.01); H01H 2229/042 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19529492 A1 19970213; EP 0758791 A2 19970219; EP 0758791 A3 19970917; EP 0758791 B1 20011219; US 5738450 A 19980414

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CHERRY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN AG, 88046 FRIEDRICHSHAFEN, DE

- Document: DE 59608483

2016-07-05 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59608483

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150630

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-06-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20011219

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59608483 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-12-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010704

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971031

1997-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1997-02-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT