Global Patent Index - EP 0758802 A4

EP 0758802 A4 2000-12-27 - ANTENNA MOUNTING DEVICE

Title (en)

ANTENNA MOUNTING DEVICE

Title (de)

ANTENNENBEFESTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE MONTAGE D'ANTENNE

Publication

EP 0758802 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96903226 A

Priority

  • JP 9600421 W
  • JP 6346595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9627217A1] An antenna mounting device for facilitating a mounting operation without a risk of falling-off nut. A washer (4) is rotatably secured to a nut (5) by caulking a ring-like rib formed on one side of the nut (5). A spacer (7) having a fit-in piece is press fitted in the washer (4) having a U-shaped cross section. Thus, the nut (5), washer (4) and spacer (7) are integrated into a nut with a washer. When this nut with a washer is set on a lower surface of a base-screw portion (3-1), the fit-in piece fits in a slit (3-4) formed in the base-screw portion (3-1), whereby the nut with a washer is prevented from falling off.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 11/02 (2006.01); H01Q 1/12 (2006.01); H01Q 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/1214 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9627217 A1 19960906; DE 69625295 D1 20030123; DE 69625295 T2 20030821; EP 0758802 A1 19970219; EP 0758802 A4 20001227; EP 0758802 B1 20021211; JP 2751146 B2 19980518; JP H08237014 A 19960913

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060203

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070223

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070901

2007-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070223

2006-02-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060203

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-02-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060203

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69625295 20030123

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020416

2000-12-27 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001115

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1997-02-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961121

1997-02-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB