Global Patent Index - EP 0758804 B1

EP 0758804 B1 2000-03-15 - Electrical terminal for a circuit breaker which terminal comprises an assembly device of the screw/nut type

Title (en)

Electrical terminal for a circuit breaker which terminal comprises an assembly device of the screw/nut type

Title (de)

Elektrische Anschlussbüchse für einen Lastschalter die mit einer Verbindungsvorrichtung des Schrauben-Mutter Typs versehen ist

Title (fr)

Borne électrique, notammant pour disjoncteur, utilisant un dispositif d'assemblage du type vis/écrou

Publication

EP 0758804 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96410086 A

Priority

FR 9509895 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0758804A1] The assembly device for terminals (4,4a,4b) of the circuit breaker, has each terminal constituted mainly by a metallic block (14) traversed by an elongated passage for a bar (10-12) of the circuit-breaker (D). The upper part has a threaded aperture for an Al or Cu bolt which ensures connection of one of the bars to the protected external circuit. At least part of the thread of the bolt and/or nut is covered with a composite metallic coating containing C particles. This lubricates the nut and bolt so that the torque necessary for tightening is reduced.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/30; H01H 71/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16B 33/06 (2006.01); H01H 71/08 (2006.01); H01H 73/02 (2006.01); H01R 4/30 (2006.01); H01R 4/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/307 (2013.01); H01H 71/08 (2013.01); H01H 2001/5861 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0758804 A1 19970219; EP 0758804 B1 20000315; CN 1147707 A 19970416; DE 69607084 D1 20000420; DE 69607084 T2 20000914; FR 2737757 A1 19970214; FR 2737757 B1 19970926; JP H09171755 A 19970630

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69607084

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120802

2013-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120802

2013-04-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120802

2012-03-01 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 69607084

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20111228

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110811

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110727

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110714

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-05-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000505

2000-05-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: EUROPATENT S.A.S.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69607084

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-20

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-03-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SA

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-09-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SA

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-04-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980313

1997-10-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970801

1997-02-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT