Global Patent Index - EP 0758808 B1

EP 0758808 B1 2002-09-11 - System of lamp holder for fluorescent lamps

Title (en)

System of lamp holder for fluorescent lamps

Title (de)

System von Lampenfassungen für Leuchtstofflampen

Title (fr)

Sytème de douille de lampe pour lampes fluorescentes

Publication

EP 0758808 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96110450 A

Priority

DE 19530115 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0758808A2] The lamp fitting has an insulating single-piece housing with an insertion opening for the lamp contacts and the conductor terminations at its base, fitted with a cover. The cover can be replaced by a similar cover (15') combined with a starter module (18) when a combined lamp fitting and starter is required, with a single injection moulded plastics component providing the cover, the starter module housing and an intermediate coupling element (17) extending between them.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 33/08; H01R 33/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 33/06 (2006.01); H01R 33/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 33/065 (2013.01); H01R 33/089 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

US 2280747 A 19420421 - BURT GUY H

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19530115 C1 19970130; AT 224112 T 20020915; EP 0758808 A2 19970219; EP 0758808 A3 19981223; EP 0758808 B1 20020911; ES 2181830 T3 20030301; US 5816837 A 19981006

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-28 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59609642

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150625

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150626

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130629

2014-07-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140707

2014-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130628

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130628

2014-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-03-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-02-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130628

2014-02-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130628

2014-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 224112 T

- Effective date: 20130628

2014-02-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130629

2014-01-15 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140101

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120627

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120627

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120712

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20120601

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120614

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120626

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-06-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59609642

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE OSTRIGA, SONNET, WIRTHS & VORWE, DE

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2181830 T3

2002-12-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609642 20021017

2002-10-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224112 T 20020915

2002-01-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SYSTEM OF LAMP HOLDER FOR FLUORESCENT LAMPS

2000-12-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BJB GMBH & CO. KG

1999-09-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990803

1999-01-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981116

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

1997-02-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE