Global Patent Index - EP 0759117 B1

EP 0759117 B1 2000-01-26 - DEVICE FOR DRIVING A TUNNEL OR DRAIN PIPE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR DRIVING A TUNNEL OR DRAIN PIPE

Title (de)

ANORDNUNG ZUM VORTRIEB EINES TUNNEL- ODER ABWASSERROHRS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR LE CREUSEMENT D'UNE CANALISATION POUR TUNNEL OU CONDUITE D'EAUX USEES

Publication

EP 0759117 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95915162 A

Priority

  • DE 4415399 A
  • EP 9501137 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4415399A1] The invention relates to a device for driving a tunnel or drain pipe along a stretch (14) leading from a starting shaft (10) to a target shaft. The device is primarily intended for making micro or mini-tunnels in which pipe sections (62) are pressed one by one into the drive stretch against a frontal driving head (16). For spoil (32) removal there is a worm conveyor engaging in the cutting chamber (26) of the drive head, to the discharge end of which can be fitted in succession a pressuretightly sealable stone trap (36) and the pressuretightly sealable intake side (42) of a thick matter pump (44), while the pressure side of the thick matter pump (44) is connected to an extendable conveyor line (56) for the spoil.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 7/20; E21D 9/00; E21D 9/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/20 (2006.01); E21D 9/00 (2006.01); E21D 9/087 (2006.01); E21D 9/12 (2006.01); E21D 9/13 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21D 9/124 (2013.01); E21B 7/208 (2013.01); E21D 9/005 (2013.01); E21D 9/13 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 4415399 A1 19951109; DE 4415399 C2 20031030; EP 0759117 A1 19970226; EP 0759117 B1 20000126; EP 0759117 B2 20040908; US 5749678 A 19980512; WO 9530065 A1 19951109

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2010-02-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090319

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-10-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: PUTZMEISTER CONCRETE PUMPS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT1

2008-05-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080325

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-09-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2005-01-03 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR3

2004-11-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20040908

2004-09-08 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20040908

2004-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE NL

2003-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: SCHWING GMBH

2003-06-18 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: SCHWING GMBH

- Effective date: 20001016

2001-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: SCHWING GMBH

2000-12-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: SCHWING GMBH

- Effective date: 20001016

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59507702

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-02

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE NL

1997-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970821

1997-06-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PUTZMEISTER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1997-02-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960809

1997-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE NL